Dept of Politics, Faculty of LA&PS
|
General Enquiries |
|
|
No. de Téléphone: |
|
(416)736-5265 (Voicemail) |
|
|
Bâtiment De Campus: |
|
Ross S672 |
|
|
Télécopieur: |
|
(416)736-5686 |
|
Graduate Enquiries |
|
|
No. de Téléphone: |
|
(416)736-5264 (Voicemail) |
|
|
Bâtiment De Campus: |
|
Ross S623A |
|
|
Télécopieur: |
|
(416)736-5686 |
|
|
Pilon, Dennis |
|
Chair, Professor |
|
Goshulak, Glenn T. |
|
Assistant Professor, Undergraduate Program Director |
|
MacRae, Heather |
|
Associate Professor, Graduate Program Director |
|
Hae, Laam |
|
Associate Professor, MA Coordinator |
|
Barreto, Margaret (Margo) |
|
Administrative Coordinator |
|
Yan, Dorothy |
|
Administrative Assistant |
|
Sarra-DeMeo, Jlenya |
|
Graduate Program Administrator |
|
Shakirova, Irina |
|
Graduate Program Administrator |
|
Chiu, Lissa |
|
Student Success & Academic Advisor |
|
Leung, Stellar |
|
Undergraduate Program Administrator |
|
Gallucci, Rose |
|
Undergraduate Program Assistant |
|
Klinakis, Despina |
|
Undergraduate Program Assistant |
|
Figueredo (she / her), Rowena Theresa |
|
Operations Manager |
|
Agathangelou, Anna |
|
Professor |
|
Albo, Greg |
|
Associate Professor (Sabbatical July 1, 2024 to June 30, 2025) |
|
Albritton, Robert R |
|
Professor Emeritus |
|
Alnasseri, Sabah |
|
Associate Professor (Sabbatical July 1, 2024 to June 30, 2025) |
|
Arora, Priyanka P |
|
Graduate Program Administrator (On Leave) |
|
Bakker, Isabella |
|
Distinguished Research Prof. |
|
Bareebe, Gerald |
|
Assistant Professor |
|
Bayefsky, Anne |
|
Professor Emerita |
|
Bazowski, Raymond |
|
Associate Professor |
|
Bell, Shannon |
|
Professor |
|
Black, Naomi |
|
Professor Emerita |
|
Bohn, Simone |
|
Associate Professor |
|
Breaugh, Martin |
|
Professor |
|
Cameron, Barbara |
|
Professor Emerita |
|
Canefe, Nergis |
|
Associate Professor |
|
Chin, Gregory Thomas |
|
Associate Professor |
|
Dauphinee, Elizabeth |
|
Professor (On Leave) |
|
Dewitt, David B. |
|
University Professor Emeritus |
|
Dosman, Edgar |
|
Professor Emeritus |
|
Drache, Daniel A. |
|
Professor Emeritus |
|
Drummond, Robert |
|
University Professor Emeritus |
|
Dufour, Caroline |
|
Associate Professor (On Leave) |
|
Farr, Arnold |
|
True Visitor |
|
Fiedlschuster, Micha |
|
Visiting Assistant Professor |
|
Fletcher, Frederick James |
|
University Professor Emeritus |
|
Forsyth, Scott |
|
Professor Emeritus |
|
Frolic, Bernard M. |
|
Professor Emeritus/Contract Faculty |
|
Gill, Stephen |
|
Distinguished Research Prof. |
|
Gindin, Sam |
|
Adjunct Professor |
|
Goldrick, Michael D |
|
Professor Emeritus |
|
Haider, Asad |
|
Assistant Professor |
|
Hellman, Judith Adler |
|
Professor Emerita |
|
Hellman, Stephen |
|
Professor Emeritus |
|
Henders, Susan J |
|
Associate Professor (On Leave) |
|
Horowitz, Asher |
|
Senior Scholar |
|
Jacobs, Lesley |
|
Professor Emeritus |
|
John, Tamanisha |
|
Assistant Professor |
|
Kernerman, Gerald |
|
Associate Professor |
|
Krikorian, Jacqueline |
|
Professor |
|
Lacher, Hannes |
|
Associate Professor |
|
Latham, Robert |
|
Professor |
|
Leyton-Brown, David |
|
Professor Emeritus |
|
Loeppky, Rodney |
|
Associate Professor (Sabbatical July 1, 2024 to June 30, 2025) |
|
MacDermid, Robert |
|
Associate Professor Emeritus |
|
Maley, Terry |
|
Associate Professor |
|
Martens, Stéphanie |
|
Assistant Professor |
|
Mawhinney, Michelle M |
|
Assistant Professor (Sabbatical January 1, 2024 to December 31, 2024) |
|
McNally, David |
|
Professor Emeritus |
|
Morera, Esteve |
|
Associate Professor |
|
Mukherjee-Reed, Ananya |
|
Professor (On Leave) |
|
Murray, Karen |
|
Associate Professor (Sabbatical January 1, 2024 to December 31, 2024) |
|
Mutimer, David |
|
Associate Dean, Faculty Affairs & Professor |
|
Newman, Stephen |
|
Professor Emeritus |
|
Newton, Janice |
|
Associate Professor Emerita |
|
Nitzan, Jonathan |
|
Professor Emeritus |
|
North, Liisa |
|
Professor Emerita |
|
Pateman, Joe |
|
Assistant Professor |
|
Plekhanov, Sergei |
|
Associate Professor |
|
Porter, Ann |
|
Associate Professor |
|
Pybus, Jennifer |
|
Assistant Professor |
|
Rudolph, Ross A |
|
University Professor Emeritus |
|
Saunders, Richard |
|
Associate Professor |
|
Short, Nicola |
|
Associate Professor |
|
Shugarman, David P |
|
Professor Emeritus |
|
Simmons, Harvey G |
|
Professor Emeritus |
|
Singh, Jakeet |
|
Associate Professor |
|
Slowey, Gabrielle |
|
Associate Professor |
|
Smardon, Bruce |
|
Associate Professor Emeritus |
|
Smolnikov, Sergey |
|
Contract Faculty - Long Service Teaching Appointment |
|
Swanson, William |
|
Retired Faculty |
|
Thakur, Monika |
|
Adjunct Faculty |
|
Tungohan, Ethel |
|
Assoc. Prof./Canada Research Chair |
|
Umar, Sanober |
|
Assistant Professor |
|
Vosko, Leah |
|
Professor/Canada Research Chair |
|
Webber, Jeffery |
|
Professor |
|
Whitaker, Reginald |
|
Professor Emeritus |
|
Whitworth, Sandra |
|
Professor Emerita |
|
Zeno, Basileus |
|
Assistant Professor |
|
|